Texas American Bank/Longview National Association

Texas – Gregg – Longview

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

23262

1980

FDIC Certificate Number: 23262
FDIC's unique number: 16300
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 815651
Report Date: 1989-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16911
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1980-11-10 Institution established. Original name: Town North National Bank.
1984-06-04 Changed name to Texas American Bank/town North, National Association .
1986-11-17 Acquired Texas American Bank/longview in Longview, Texas.
1986-11-17 Changed name to Texas American Bank/longview National Association .
1989-07-20 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Texas American Bridge Bank, National Association in Fort Worth, Texas.
1989-09-22 Changed name to Team Bank, National Association .
1990-02-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Team Bank in Fort Worth, Texas.
1991-01-31 Acquired Bank Of The Hills in Austin, Texas.
1991-05-31 Acquired North Texas Federal Savings Association in Wichita Falls, Texas.
1991-06-13 Acquired Tascosa National Bank Of Amarillo in Amarillo, Texas.
1991-10-10 Acquired First National Bank in Fredericksburg, Texas.
1992-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1993-04-09 Acquired United National Bank in Denton, Texas.
1994-03-07 Acquired Parkdale Bank in Beaumont, Texas.
1995-03-10 Acquired 1st*bank in Coppell, Texas.
2001-02-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2001-08-23 Acquired Bank One, Florida in Venice, Florida.
2001-11-09 Acquired Bank One, Arizona, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2001-11-09 Acquired Bank One, Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2002-06-21 Acquired Bank One, Michigan in Detroit, Michigan.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Wisconsin in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Colorado, National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $90,055,000
Total deposits: $91,439,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Texas American Bank/Longview National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Texas American Bank/Longview National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Texas American Bank/Longview National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-265

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.