The American Bank

Wisconsin – Buffalo – Alma

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

13050

1906

FDIC Certificate Number: 13050
FDIC's unique number: 8249
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Eau Claire

Federal Reserve ID Number: 502951
Report Date: 1986-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1906-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The American Bank.
1986-06-20 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Alma in Alma, Wisconsin.

Total assets: $40,024,000
Total deposits: $36,175,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The American Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The American Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The American Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-79

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.