The Bank of Fruitland

Maryland – Wicomico – Fruitland

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

5862

1911

FDIC Certificate Number: 5862
FDIC's unique number: 4005
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore

Federal Reserve ID Number: 813929
Report Date: 2000-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-12-28

1911-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Fruitland.
2000-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Peninsula Bank in Princess Anne, Maryland.
2004-08-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile Peninsula Bank in Selbyville, Delaware.
2007-09-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.

Total assets: $134,476,000
Total deposits: $117,294,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Bank of Fruitland does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Bank of Fruitland, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank of Fruitland will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-343

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.