The Casey County Bank, Inc.

Kentucky – Casey – Liberty

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

15708

1939

FDIC Certificate Number: 15708
FDIC's unique number: 9974
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington

Federal Reserve ID Number: 646145
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-11-03

1939-12-20 Institution established. Original name: The Casey County Bank.
1981-07-16 Changed name to The Casey County Bank, Inc., Liberty, Kentucky .
1989-03-13 Reorganized.
1989-03-13 Changed name to The Casey County Bank, Inc. .
2009-11-02 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2009-11-02 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.

Total assets: $158,602,000
Total deposits: $130,071,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $130,071,000
Equity capital: $19,487,000

Net income: $977,000

Return on Assets: 1.22
Return on Equity: 10.31
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Casey County Bancorp, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Casey County Bank, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Casey County Bank, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Casey County Bank, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-215

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.