The Clark County State Bank

Indiana – Clark – Jeffersonville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

15551

1917

FDIC Certificate Number: 15551
FDIC's unique number: 9845
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 104243
Report Date: 1984-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1917-11-07 Institution established. Original name: The Clark County State Bank.
1984-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commerce America Banking Company in Jeffersonville, Indiana.
1988-04-01 Changed name to Commerceamerica Banking Company .
1989-04-01 Changed name to Inb Banking Company .
1989-04-01 Acquired Old Capital Bank And Trust Company in Corydon, Indiana.
1991-09-01 Acquired The State Bank Of Salem in Salem, Indiana.
1993-09-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NBD Bank, National Association in Gary, Indiana.
1993-10-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NBD Bank, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
1999-06-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2002-08-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $99,632,000
Total deposits: $88,433,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Clark County State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Clark County State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Clark County State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-160

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.