The Farmers Bank of Appomattox

Virginia – Appomattox – Appomattox

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

6813

1918

FDIC Certificate Number: 6813
FDIC's unique number: 4583
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 188720
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-01-29

1918-09-16 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers National Bank Of Appomattox.
1992-08-31 Changed name to The Farmers Bank Of Appomattox .

Total assets: $185,637,000
Total deposits: $157,106,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $157,106,000
Equity capital: $22,273,000

Net income: $947,000

Return on Assets: 1.01
Return on Equity: 8.78
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Farmers Bank of Appomattox does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Farmers Bank of Appomattox, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Farmers Bank of Appomattox will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-219

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.