The Farmers State Bank

Indiana – Harrison – Lanesville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

12830

1910

FDIC Certificate Number: 12830
FDIC's unique number: 8126
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 43641
Report Date: 2008-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2008-06-26

1910-07-07 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers State Bank.
2008-06-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Federal Savings Bank of Elizabethtown in Elizabethtown, Kentucky.

Total assets: $64,141,000
Total deposits: $53,809,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Farmers State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Farmers State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Farmers State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-126

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.