The First National Bank of Nelsonville

Ohio – Athens – Nelsonville

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

398

1910

FDIC Certificate Number: 398
FDIC's unique number: 305
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 201124
Report Date: 2008-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14473
The date of the last data update: 2008-12-03

1910-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Nelsonville.
1983-01-01 Changed name to The Huntington National Bank Of Nelsonville .
1985-01-02 Changed name to The First National Bank Of Nelsonville .
2008-10-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of McConnelsville in Mc Connelsville, Ohio.
2011-01-20 Moved bank headquarters from Nelsonville, Ohio to Mcconnelsville, Ohio.

Total assets: $54,730,000
Total deposits: $50,374,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First National Bank of Nelsonville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Nelsonville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Nelsonville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-170

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.