The First National Bank of Stockton

Illinois – Jo Daviess – Stockton

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

3742

1933

FDIC Certificate Number: 3742
FDIC's unique number: 2407
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Princeton

Federal Reserve ID Number: 592345
Report Date: 1986-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13666
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1933-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Stockton.
1987-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank of Stockton/Warren in Stockton, Illinois.
1987-12-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1989-07-01 Changed name to First Bank North .
1989-07-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Freeport in Freeport, Illinois.
1989-07-01 Acquired Mount Carroll National Bank in Mount Carroll, Illinois.
1997-04-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Grand National Bank in Wauconda, Illinois.
2000-04-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Old Kent Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
2000-07-14 Acquired Old Kent, National Association in Freeport, Illinois.
2000-10-13 Acquired Home Loan Bank Fsb in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
2001-04-27 Changed name to Fifth Third Bank .
2003-12-31 Acquired The Fifth Third Bank Of Northern Kentucky, Inc. in Covington, Kentucky.
2003-12-31 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Kentucky, Inc. in Louisville, Kentucky.
2003-12-31 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Florida in Naples, Florida.
2003-12-31 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2005-01-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Florida in Naples, Florida.
2005-02-28 Acquired First National Wealth Management Company in Naples, Florida.
2008-10-31 Acquired Freedom Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Cincinnati, Ohio.

Total assets: $26,548,000
Total deposits: $24,028,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First National Bank of Stockton does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Stockton, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Stockton will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-187

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.