The First National Bank of Watervliet

Michigan – Berrien – Watervliet

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

5050

1874

FDIC Certificate Number: 5050
FDIC's unique number: 3372
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Grand Rapids

Federal Reserve ID Number: 87645
Report Date: 1980-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 10498
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-25

1874-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Watervliet.
1981-02-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Peoples State Bank of St. Joseph in St. Joseph, Michigan.
1984-11-13 Moved bank headquarters from Watervliet, Michigan to St. Joseph, Michigan.
1986-07-01 Reorganized.
1986-08-13 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1988-02-12 Acquired The First State Bank, White Cloud, Michigan in White Cloud, Michigan.
1990-02-02 Acquired Peoples Savings Association, FA in St. Joseph, Michigan.
1992-12-14 Acquired Harbor Country Banking Company in Three Oaks, Michigan.
1996-04-29 Changed name to Pinnacle Bank .
1996-12-31 Acquired Pinnacle Bank in Merrillville, Indiana.
1997-08-01 Acquired Indiana Federal Bank For Savings in Valparaiso, Indiana.
1997-08-01 Acquired Community Bank, A Fsb in Michigan City, Indiana.
1998-12-31 Changed name to Citizens Bank Of Midamerica .
1998-12-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1998-12-31 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Central Indiana in Greenwood, Indiana.
1998-12-31 Acquired The Citizens National Bank Of Evansville in Evansville, Indiana.
1998-12-31 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Kentucky in Madisonville, Kentucky.
1998-12-31 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Illinois, National Association in Mount Vernon, Illinois.
1998-12-31 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Southern Indiana in Tell City, Indiana.
1998-12-31 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Western Indiana in Terre Haute, Indiana.
1998-12-31 Acquired Citizens Trust Company Of Indiana Inc., National Association in Evansville, Indiana.
1999-04-27 Changed name to Civitas Bank .
2000-03-18 Changed name to Fifth Third Bank, Indiana .
2000-03-18 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2000-12-09 Acquired Ameribank in Holland, Michigan.
2001-05-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank, Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2001-12-29 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Southwest, F.S.B. in Scottsdale, Arizona.
2003-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
2005-01-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Florida in Naples, Florida.
2005-02-28 Acquired First National Wealth Management Company in Naples, Florida.
2008-10-31 Acquired Freedom Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Cincinnati, Ohio.

Total assets: $24,912,000
Total deposits: $23,030,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First National Bank of Watervliet does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Watervliet, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Watervliet will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-283

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.