The Gnadenhutten Bank

Ohio – Tuscarawas – Gnadenhutten

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

396

1923

FDIC Certificate Number: 396
FDIC's unique number: 303
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 231813
Report Date: 1979-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1923-08-01 Institution established. Original name: The Gnadenhutten Bank.
1979-09-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Peoples National Bank and Trust Company in Dover, Ohio.
1979-10-22 Changed name to Bank One Of Dover, N.A. .
1984-01-01 Changed name to Bank One, Dover, National Association .
1986-03-08 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1986-10-01 Acquired The United Bank in Uhrichsville, Ohio.
1997-05-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
1998-04-01 Acquired First Usa Federal Savings Bank in Wilmington, Delaware.
2003-08-08 Acquired Bank One, West Virginia, National Association in Huntington, West Virginia.
2003-08-08 Acquired Bank One, Wheeling-steubenville, National Association in Wheeling, West Virginia.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $11,916,000
Total deposits: $10,461,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Gnadenhutten Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Gnadenhutten Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Gnadenhutten Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-166

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.