The Merchants National Bank of Montgomery

West Virginia – Fayette – Montgomery

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

6778

1910

FDIC Certificate Number: 6778
FDIC's unique number: 4555
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot

Federal Reserve ID Number: 892531
Report Date: 1997-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 9740
The date of the last data update: 1998-01-07

1910-04-27 Institution established. Original name: The Merchants National Bank Of Montgomery.
1990-03-01 Acquired The Gauley National Bank in Gauley Bridge, West Virginia.
1993-09-17 Acquired Evergreen Federal Savings And Loan Association in Charleston, West Virginia as part of a government assisted transaction.
1997-12-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The City National Bank of Charleston in Charleston, West Virginia.
1998-06-01 Changed name to City National Bank Of West Virginia .
1999-04-12 Acquired First National Bank In Marlinton in Marlinton, West Virginia.
1999-04-26 Acquired Bank Of Raleigh in Beckley, West Virginia.
1999-04-26 Acquired Greenbrier Valley National Bank in Lewisburg, West Virginia.
1999-04-26 Acquired The National Bank Of Summers Of Hinton in Hinton, West Virginia.
1999-04-26 Acquired The Twentieth Street Bank in Huntington, West Virginia.
2005-05-20 Acquired Classic Bank in Ashland, Kentucky.

Total assets: $138,201,000
Total deposits: $87,512,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Merchants National Bank of Montgomery does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Merchants National Bank of Montgomery, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Merchants National Bank of Montgomery will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-270

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.