The Nicollet County Bank of Saint Peter

Minnesota – Nicollet – Saint Peter

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

9757

1883

FDIC Certificate Number: 9757
FDIC's unique number: 6244
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mankato

Federal Reserve ID Number: 768252
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1883-03-22 Institution established. Original name: The Nicollet County Bank Of Saint Peter.
2004-08-02 Moved bank headquarters from St. Peter, Minnesota to Saint Peter, Minnesota.

Total assets: $152,262,000
Total deposits: $135,938,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $135,938,000
Equity capital: $12,066,000

Net income: $673,000

Return on Assets: 0.91
Return on Equity: 11.31
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Saint Peter Agency, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Nicollet County Bank of Saint Peter does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Nicollet County Bank of Saint Peter, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Nicollet County Bank of Saint Peter will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-224

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.