The Provident Bank

New Jersey – Hudson – Jersey City

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

12010

1839

FDIC Certificate Number: 12010
FDIC's unique number: 7655
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 204004
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB

Number of Domestic Offices: 84
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-07-27

1839-02-28 Institution established. Original name: Provident Savings Bank.
1977-12-30 Acquired The First National Bank Of Dunellen in Dunellen, New Jersey.
1983-02-19 Acquired Bloomfield Savings Bank in Bloomfield, New Jersey.
1991-07-26 Acquired Suburban National Bank in Hillsborough, New Jersey.
1991-08-16 Acquired Mutual Aid Federal Savings And Loan Association in Manasquan, New Jersey.
1998-12-23 Acquired Monarch Bank, Fsb in Kearny, New Jersey.
2000-12-11 Changed name to The Provident Bank .
2004-07-14 Acquired First Savings Bank in Woodbridge, New Jersey.
2007-04-01 Acquired First Morris Bank And Trust in Morris Township, New Jersey.

Total assets: $6,880,281,000
Total deposits: $5,015,565,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $5,015,565,000
Equity capital: $856,754,000

Net income: $26,454,000

Return on Assets: 0.77
Return on Equity: 6.27
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Provident Financial Services, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Provident Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Provident Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Provident Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-37

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.