The Salt Creek Valley Bank

Ohio – Hocking – Laurelville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

13677

1923

FDIC Certificate Number: 13677
FDIC's unique number: 8550
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 838427
Report Date: 2007-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-09-13

1923-04-10 Institution established. Original name: The Salt Creek Valley Bank.
1994-10-31 Reorganized.
2007-08-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Vinton County National Bank of McArthur in Mcarthur, Ohio.
2009-02-21 Acquired The First Bremen Bank in Bremen, Ohio.

Total assets: $35,426,000
Total deposits: $30,490,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Salt Creek Valley Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Salt Creek Valley Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Salt Creek Valley Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-328

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.