The State Bank of New Jersey

New Jersey – Bergen – Fort Lee

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20257

1970

FDIC Certificate Number: 20257
FDIC's unique number: 13936
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 984203
Report Date: 1980-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1970-09-24 Institution established. Original name: The State Bank Of New Jersey.
1972-12-27 Changed name to State Bank Of Fort Lee .
1976-06-03 Changed name to The State Bank Of New Jersey .
1980-08-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Midland Bank and Trust Company in Paramus, New Jersey.
1997-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Valley National Bank in Passaic, New Jersey.
1998-10-16 Acquired Wayne Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Wayne, New Jersey.
1999-06-11 Acquired The Ramapo Bank in Wayne Township, New Jersey.
2001-01-19 Acquired The Merchants Bank Of New York in New York City, New York.
2001-12-26 Reorganized.
2005-03-31 Acquired Shrewsbury State Bank in Shrewsbury, New Jersey.
2005-06-03 Acquired Norcrown Bank in Livingston, New Jersey.
2008-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Passaic, New Jersey to Wayne, New Jersey.
2008-07-01 Acquired Greater Community Bank in Totowa, New Jersey.
2008-09-12 Reorganized.
2010-03-11 Acquired Libertypointe Bank in New York, New York as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-03-12 Acquired The Park Avenue Bank in New York, New York as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $51,847,000
Total deposits: $46,938,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The State Bank of New Jersey does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The State Bank of New Jersey, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The State Bank of New Jersey will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-90

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.