The United Savings and Loan Association of Trenton New Jersey

New Jersey – Mercer – Trenton

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

27617

1915

FDIC Certificate Number: 27617
FDIC's unique number: 40451
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 771579
Report Date: 1990-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-01

1915-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The United Savings And Loan Association Of Trenton New Jersey.
1986-10-31 Acquired The Allentown Savings And Loan Association Of Allentown in Allentown, New Jersey.
1990-06-15 Failed, went into receivership, and then became United Savings and Loan Association of Trenton, F.A. in Trenton, New Jersey.
1991-09-06 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Penn Savings Bank FSB in Wyomissing, Pennsylvania.
1991-12-31 Changed name to Sovereign Bank, A Federal Savings Bank .
1991-12-31 Moved bank headquarters from Trenton, New Jersey to Wyomissing, Pennsylvania.
1991-12-31 Acquired Yardley Bank For Savings, Fsb in Yardley, Pennsylvania.
1992-09-11 Acquired Jersey Shore Savings And Loan Association in Toms River, New Jersey.
1993-01-16 Acquired Harmonia Savings Bank in Elizabeth, New Jersey.
1993-08-27 Acquired Home Unity Federal Savings And Loan Association in Lafayette Hill, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
1993-11-06 Acquired Valley Federal Savings And Loan Association in Easton, Pennsylvania.
1994-08-05 Acquired Shadow Lawn Savings Bank, Sla in Long Branch, New Jersey.
1994-10-31 Acquired Charter Federal Savings Bank in Randolph Township, New Jersey.
1996-05-31 Acquired West Jersey Community Bank in Fairfield, New Jersey.
1996-12-23 Changed name to Sovereign Bank .
1997-02-19 Acquired First Dewitt Bank in West Caldwell, New Jersey.
1997-03-31 Acquired Sovereign Community Bank in Freehold, New Jersey.
1997-08-30 Acquired Bankers Savings in Perth Amboy, New Jersey.
1998-03-01 Acquired Main Line Bank in Villanova, Pennsylvania.
1998-07-31 Acquired Carnegie Bank, National Association in Langhorne, Pennsylvania.
1998-07-31 Acquired First Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Pennsville, New Jersey.
1999-06-30 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1999-06-30 Acquired Trenton Savings Bank Fsb in Lawrenceville, New Jersey.
2002-03-08 Acquired Main Street Bank in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-05-03 Acquired Sovereign Trust Company in Manchester Township, New Jersey.
2004-02-06 Acquired First Essex Bank in Lawrence, Massachusetts.
2004-07-23 Acquired Nantucket Bank in Nantucket, Massachusetts.
2004-07-23 Acquired Compass Bank For Savings in New Bedford, Massachusetts.
2005-02-11 Acquired Waypoint Bank in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
2006-09-09 Acquired Independence Community Bank in Brooklyn, New York.
2011-06-20 Moved bank headquarters from Wyomissing, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $277,721,000
Total deposits: $277,303,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The United Savings and Loan Association of Trenton New Jersey does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The United Savings and Loan Association of Trenton New Jersey, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The United Savings and Loan Association of Trenton New Jersey will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-117

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.