The Wyandotte Bank

Kansas – Wyandotte – Kansas City

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

18891

1963

FDIC Certificate Number: 18891
FDIC's unique number: 12742
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 95350
Report Date: 1994-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-10-13

1963-09-23 Institution established. Original name: Wyandotte County State Bank.
1976-01-29 Changed name to The Wyandotte Bank .
1991-11-01 Moved bank headquarters from Wyandotte County, Kansas to Kansas City, Kansas.
1994-09-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank Midwest of Kansas, National Association in Lenexa, Kansas.
1995-02-17 Changed name to Bank Midwest, National Association .
1995-02-17 Acquired Bank Midwest, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1995-05-08 Acquired Citizens Bank & Trust Of Kansas City in Kansas City, Kansas.
2001-01-12 Acquired The Cameron Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Cameron, Missouri.
2001-02-17 Acquired Hardin Federal Savings Bank in Hardin, Missouri.
2003-06-13 Acquired Founders Bank in Chesterfield, Missouri.
2010-12-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Armed Forces Bank, National Association in Fort Leavenworth, Kansas.

Total assets: $61,376,000
Total deposits: $54,971,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Wyandotte Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Wyandotte Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Wyandotte Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-288

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.