Tombigbee Bank & Trust Company

Mississippi – Itawamba – Fulton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21932

1975

FDIC Certificate Number: 21932
FDIC's unique number: 15200
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms

Federal Reserve ID Number: 149347
Report Date: 1985-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1975-02-25 Institution established. Original name: Tombigbee Bank & Trust Company.
1985-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Merchants & Farmers Bank in Columbus, Mississippi.
1986-02-18 Changed name to Unisouth Banking Corporation .
1993-07-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Trustmark National Bank in Jackson, Mississippi.
1994-10-07 Acquired First National Bank Of Vicksburg in Vicksburg, Mississippi.
1997-02-28 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce Of Corinth in Corinth, Mississippi.
1997-09-19 Acquired Perry County Bank in New Augusta, Mississippi.
1998-03-14 Acquired Smith County Bank in Taylorsville, Mississippi.
2001-04-06 Acquired Peoples Bank in Barretville, Tennessee.
2001-12-14 Acquired Nashoba Bank in Germantown, Tennessee.
2003-08-22 Acquired Southern Community Bank, Atlantic in Destin, Florida.
2004-01-23 Acquired Plaza Bank in Houston, Texas.
2006-08-25 Acquired Republic National Bank in Houston, Texas.
2011-04-15 Acquired Heritage Banking Group in Carthage, Mississippi as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $23,845,000
Total deposits: $21,607,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Tombigbee Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Tombigbee Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Tombigbee Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-199

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.