Tri-State Bank and Trust

Louisiana – Bossier – Haughton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

27611

1989

FDIC Certificate Number: 27611
FDIC's unique number: 40445
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1406980
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1989-10-26 Institution established. Original name: Tri-state Bank And Trust.
1989-10-26 Acquired First Security Bank And Trust Company in Haughton, Louisiana.
1991-04-11 Acquired American Bank & Trust Company in Shreveport, Louisiana.

Total assets: $32,805,000
Total deposits: $27,627,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $27,627,000
Equity capital: $5,118,000

Net income: $563,000

Return on Assets: 3.4
Return on Equity: 22.19
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Tri-State Bancshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Tri-State Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Tri-State Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Tri-State Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-122

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.