U.S. Trust Company of New Jersey

New Jersey – Mercer – Princeton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

33757

1992

FDIC Certificate Number: 33757
FDIC's unique number: 47967
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2009360
Report Date: 2001-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2002-03-20

1992-11-13 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: U.S. Trust Company.
1997-02-14 Changed trust powers from Limited Trust Powers Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1997-02-14 Changed name to U.S. Trust Company Of New Jersey .
1997-02-14 Changed primary regulatory agency from State to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1997-02-14 Became FDIC insured.
2001-09-17 Moved bank headquarters from West Windsor, New Jersey to Princeton, New Jersey.
2002-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United States Trust Company of New York in New York City, New York.
2006-03-31 Changed name to United States Trust Company , National Association .
2006-03-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2006-03-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2006-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Princeton, New Jersey to New York, New York.
2006-03-31 Acquired U.S. Trust Company, National Association in Greenwich, Connecticut.
2008-02-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2008-03-18 Moved bank headquarters from New York, New York to Charlotte, North Carolina.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $150,608,000
Total deposits: $108,149,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

U.S. Trust Company of New Jersey does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with U.S. Trust Company of New Jersey, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and U.S. Trust Company of New Jersey will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-235

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.