Union Bank

Missouri – Jackson – Kansas City

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

19582

1965

FDIC Certificate Number: 19582
FDIC's unique number: 13382
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 687858
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-08-12

1965-11-09 Institution established. Original name: Bannister Bank.
1981-04-08 Changed name to Bannister Bank And Trust .
2001-05-04 Acquired Union Bank in Kansas City, Missouri.
2001-05-04 Changed name to Union Bank .

Total assets: $511,876,000
Total deposits: $411,278,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $411,278,000
Equity capital: $34,203,000

Net income: $576,000

Return on Assets: 0.22
Return on Equity: 3.4
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: First Olathe Bancshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Union Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Union Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Union Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-358

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.