Union National Bank of Kansas City

Missouri – Jackson – Kansas City

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

18762

1963

FDIC Certificate Number: 18762
FDIC's unique number: 12627
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 599250
Report Date: 1986-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15083
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1963-04-29 Institution established. Original name: Civic Plaza National Bank Of Kansas City.
1983-01-24 Changed name to Union National Bank Of Kansas City .
1986-10-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Bank in Kansas City, Missouri.
1996-10-15 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Southern Missouri in Ava, Missouri.
2001-05-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Bank in Kansas City, Missouri.

Total assets: $14,125,000
Total deposits: $13,121,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Union National Bank of Kansas City does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Union National Bank of Kansas City, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Union National Bank of Kansas City will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-300

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.