United States Savings Bank of Newark, N. J.

New Jersey – Essex – Newark

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

12015

1871

FDIC Certificate Number: 12015
FDIC's unique number: 7658
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 501507
Report Date: 1982-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1982-03-18

1871-01-01 Institution established. Original name: United States Savings Bank Of Newark, N. J.
1982-03-11 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1982-03-12 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Hudson City Savings Bank in Jersey City, New Jersey.
1982-05-14 Moved bank headquarters from Newark, New Jersey to Paramus, New Jersey.
1984-09-29 Acquired Orange Savings Bank in Livingston, New Jersey.
1995-07-17 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1999-07-13 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2004-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2004-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2006-07-14 Acquired Sound Federal Savings in White Plains, New York.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

United States Savings Bank of Newark, N. J. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with United States Savings Bank of Newark, N. J., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United States Savings Bank of Newark, N. J. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-33

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.