Valley Bank

Idaho – Bonneville – Idaho Falls

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

16709

1948

FDIC Certificate Number: 16709
FDIC's unique number: 10831
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Salt Lake City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 439169
Report Date: 1992-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1992-06-17

1948-07-12 Institution established. Original name: Valley Bank.
1979-12-10 Moved bank headquarters from Rexburg, Idaho to Idaho Falls, Idaho.
1992-06-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Key Bank of Idaho in Boise, Idaho.
1997-01-13 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1997-01-13 Moved bank headquarters from Idaho Falls, Idaho to Boise, Idaho.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $220,373,000
Total deposits: $190,034,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Valley Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Valley Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Valley Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-214

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.