Waterfield Bank, FA

Maryland – Montgomery – Germantown

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

59036

2010

FDIC Certificate Number: 59036
FDIC's unique number: 505846
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore

Federal Reserve ID Number: 4096346
Report Date: 2010-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2010-07-08

2010-03-05 Institution established. Original name: Waterfield Bank, FA.
2010-03-05 Acquired Waterfield Bank in Germantown, Maryland as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-30 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Waterfield Bank, FA does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Waterfield Bank, FA, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Waterfield Bank, FA will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-125

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.