West Valley Bank

California – Los Angeles – Woodland Hills

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

22673

1978

FDIC Certificate Number: 22673
FDIC's unique number: 15825
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 444864
Report Date: 1984-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1978-06-28 Institution established. Original name: West Valley Bank.
1985-02-08 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First Interstate Bank, Ltd. in Los Angeles, California.
1989-08-16 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1997-10-31 Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd. .

Total assets: $48,262,000
Total deposits: $43,364,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

West Valley Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with West Valley Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and West Valley Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-144

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.