Westborough Savings Bank

Massachusetts – Worcester – Westborough

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

90299

1869

FDIC Certificate Number: 90299
FDIC's unique number: 17888
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma

Federal Reserve ID Number: 704906
Report Date: 2007-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 2007-09-04

1869-01-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Westborough Savings Bank.
1985-09-05 Became FDIC insured.
2000-02-16 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2007-08-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Avidia Bank in Hudson, Massachusetts.

Total assets: $297,124,000
Total deposits: $213,132,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Westborough Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Westborough Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Westborough Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-376

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.