Western State Bank

Texas – Denton – Denton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

18760

1963

FDIC Certificate Number: 18760
FDIC's unique number: 12625
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 629755
Report Date: 1985-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
OCC Charter Number: 15082
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1963-04-26 Institution established. Original name: Western National Bank Of Denton, Texas.
1976-06-09 Changed name to Western State Bank .
1985-09-27 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Texas Bank of Denton in Denton, Texas.
1989-03-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Texas Bank in Weatherford, Texas.
1990-03-08 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Denton, Texas.
1993-07-31 Acquired Texas Bank in Grapevine, Texas.
2003-08-25 Changed name to Texasbank .
2003-08-25 Moved bank headquarters from Weatherford, Texas to Fort Worth, Texas.
2005-06-17 Acquired Northwest National Bank Of Arlington in Arlington, Texas.
2006-03-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Compass Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2008-03-13 Acquired The Laredo National Bank in Laredo, Texas.
2008-03-13 Acquired Texas State Bank in Mcallen, Texas.
2008-03-13 Acquired State National Bank in Fort Worth, Texas.
2009-08-21 Acquired Guaranty Bank in Austin, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-11 Acquired Bbva Bancomer Usa in Diamond Bar, California.
2009-09-11 Acquired Central Bank Of The South in Anniston, Alabama.

Total assets: $27,831,000
Total deposits: $23,678,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Western State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Western State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Western State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-298

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.