California – San Bernardino – Redlands
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
California
San Bernardino
Redlands
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
33025
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33025
FDIC's unique number: 46233
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (North)
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1463705
Report Date: 2008-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2009-02-02
1990-08-01 Institution established. Original name: Redlands Centennial Bank.
2002-05-24 Acquired Palomar Community Bank in Escondido, California.
2003-03-03 Changed name to 1st Centennial Bank .
2009-01-23 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First California Bank in Westlake Village, California.
2009-01-23 FDIC closing information for
1st Centennial Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/centennial.html.
2011-02-18 Acquired San Luis Trust Bank, Fsb in San Luis Obispo, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $797,959,000
Total deposits: $678,570,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
1st Centennial Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with 1st Centennial Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and 1st Centennial Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13889