Ohio – Highland – Hillsboro
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Ohio
Highland
Hillsboro
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
757
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 757
FDIC's unique number: 481
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus
Federal Reserve ID Number: 699422
Report Date: 1989-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1909-03-07 Institution established. Original name: The Hillsboro Bank And Savings Company.
1978-01-30 Acquired The Farmers Exchange Bank in Lynchburg, Ohio.
1978-01-30 Changed name to 1st Security Bank .
1989-12-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Fifth Third Bank of Southern Ohio in Hillsboro, Ohio.
1998-10-02 Changed name to Fifth Third Bank, Ohio Valley .
1999-04-17 Acquired Bank Of Ashland, Inc. in Ashland, Kentucky.
2000-12-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Cincinnati, Ohio.
2001-03-10 Acquired Capital Bank National Association in Sylvania, Ohio.
2009-09-30 Acquired Fifth Third Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
2009-09-30 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
Total assets: $139,087,000
Total deposits: $122,041,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
1st Security Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with 1st Security Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and 1st Security Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12805