Montana – Yellowstone – Laurel
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Montana
Yellowstone
Laurel
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
20662
1972
FDIC Certificate Number: 20662
FDIC's unique number: 14262
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 679152
Report Date: 1999-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1999-11-05
1972-04-17 Institution established. Original name: 1st Security Bank Of Laurel.
1999-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Citizens Bank of Billings in Billings, Montana.
2007-01-27 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Western Security Bank in Billings, Montana.
2011-04-19 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2011-04-19 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
Total assets: $22,558,000
Total deposits: $20,778,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
1st Security Bank of Laurel does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with 1st Security Bank of Laurel, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and 1st Security Bank of Laurel will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22890