Montana – Gallatin – West Yellowstone
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Montana
Gallatin
West Yellowstone
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
19593
1966
FDIC Certificate Number: 19593
FDIC's unique number: 13392
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 567053
Report Date: 2001-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2001-05-23
1966-06-06 Institution established. Original name: 1st Security Bank Of West Yellowstone, Montana.
2001-05-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Security Bank in Bozeman, Montana.
2002-10-25 Acquired First State Bank Of Fort Benton in Fort Benton, Montana.
Total assets: $37,865,000
Total deposits: $31,102,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
1st Security Bank of West Yellowstone, Montana does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with 1st Security Bank of West Yellowstone, Montana, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and 1st Security Bank of West Yellowstone, Montana will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10461