Oklahoma – Alfalfa – Cherokee
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.acbbankonline.com
Oklahoma
Alfalfa
Cherokee
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
4061
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 4061
FDIC's unique number: 2636
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 266253
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-10-05
1908-01-29 Institution established. Original name: The Alfalfa County National Bank Of Cherokee.
1977-02-01 Changed name to Alfalfa County Bank .
1977-02-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2004-05-13 Changed name to Acb .
2006-06-19 Changed name to Acb Bank .
Total assets: $69,343,000
Total deposits: $60,480,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $60,480,000
Equity capital: $5,713,000
Net income: $494,000
Return on Assets: 1.43
Return on Equity: 18.85
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Alfalfa County Bancshares, Inc.
Acb Bank - Acb Bank
Acb Bank - Garber Branch
Acb Bank - Waukomis Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
ACB Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with ACB Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and ACB Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8063