Georgia – Clarke – Athens
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Clarke
Athens
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
28225
1929
FDIC Certificate Number: 28225
FDIC's unique number: 41059
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 947178
Report Date: 2010-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-14
1929-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Athens Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1980-03-31 Acquired Commerce Building And Loan Association in Commerce, Georgia.
1981-11-30 Acquired Franklin Federal Savings And Loan Association in Lavonia, Georgia.
1981-11-30 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Sandersville, Georgia.
1984-09-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1985-07-31 Changed name to Athens Federal Savings Bank .
1991-08-31 Changed name to Athens First Bank And Trust Company .
1991-08-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Powers Granted, Exercised.
1991-08-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1991-08-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1998-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Georgia in Watkinsville, Georgia.
2001-04-20 Changed trust powers from Limited Powers Granted, Exercised to Trust Powers Terminated.
2005-10-03 Changed name to Afb&t; .
2008-09-15 Acquired The National Bank Of Walton County in Monroe, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Synovus Bank in Columbus, Georgia.
2010-06-30 Acquired The Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Tennessee.
2010-06-30 Acquired Trust One Bank in Memphis, Tennessee.
Total assets: $1,538,231,000
Total deposits: $1,255,529,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
AFB&T does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with AFB&T, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and AFB&T will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15747