California – Los Angeles – Culver City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
California
Los Angeles
Culver City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
23124
1980
FDIC Certificate Number: 23124
FDIC's unique number: 16199
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)
Federal Reserve ID Number: 720465
Report Date: 2008-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2009-02-09
1980-05-15 Institution established. Original name: Alliance Bank Of Culver City.
1981-10-01 Changed name to Alliance Bank .
2009-02-06 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of California Bank & Trust in San Diego, California.
2009-02-06 FDIC closing information for
Alliance Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/alliance.html.
Total assets: $1,113,361,000
Total deposits: $951,106,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Alliance Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Alliance Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Alliance Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23042