Colorado – Mesa – Clifton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Colorado
Mesa
Clifton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
33210
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33210
FDIC's unique number: 46451
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1717631
Report Date: 1995-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-12-11
1990-11-27 Institution established. Original name: Alpine Bank, Clifton.
1991-11-26 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1994-01-19 Changed name to Alpine Bank, Grand Junction .
1995-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Alpine Bank and Trust in Glenwood Springs, Colorado.
1995-12-05 Changed name to Alpine Bank .
2006-01-01 Acquired First National Bank in Telluride, Colorado.
Total assets: $30,737,000
Total deposits: $28,866,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Alpine Bank, Grand Junction does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Alpine Bank, Grand Junction, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Alpine Bank, Grand Junction will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18899