Colorado – Routt – Steamboat Springs
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Colorado
Routt
Steamboat Springs
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
32777
1989
FDIC Certificate Number: 32777
FDIC's unique number: 45687
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 781671
Report Date: 1990-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1995-02-06
1989-08-24 Institution established. Original name: Alpine Savings, A Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1989-08-24 Acquired Alpine Federal Savings And Loan Association in Steamboat Springs, Colorado.
1990-06-22 Government conservatorship or bridge bank resolved.
1990-06-22 Ceased operations as a result of a government supervised payoff, liquidation or closing. No active institution received any of deposits.
Total assets: $43,266,000
Total deposits: $37,027,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Alpine Savings, a Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Alpine Savings, a Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Alpine Savings, a Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11341