Oklahoma – Tulsa – Collinsville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.americanbankok.com
Oklahoma
Tulsa
Collinsville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34606
1998
FDIC Certificate Number: 34606
FDIC's unique number: 60771
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2684552
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-01-10
1998-04-01 Institution established. Original name: American Bank Of Oklahoma.
2001-10-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2001-10-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2001-10-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2006-12-07 Acquired Territory Bank in Muskogee, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $138,137,000
Total deposits: $118,597,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $118,597,000
Equity capital: $11,496,000
Net income: $505,000
Return on Assets: 0.74
Return on Equity: 8.93
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Ameribank Holding Company
American Bank Of Oklahoma - American Bank Of Oklahoma
American Bank Of Oklahoma - Chandler Road Branch
American Bank Of Oklahoma - Muskogee Branch
American Bank Of Oklahoma - Ramona Branch
American Bank Of Oklahoma - Skiatook Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
American Bank of Oklahoma does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with American Bank of Oklahoma, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Bank of Oklahoma will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23075