Oregon – Marion – Salem
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Oregon
Marion
Salem
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
29151
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 29151
FDIC's unique number: 41985
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Portland
Federal Reserve ID Number: 780076
Report Date: 1987-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10
1934-09-01 Institution established. Original name: American Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1976-08-31 Acquired American Savings And Loan Association in Portland, Oregon.
1987-08-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of American Home Savings, A F.S.B. in Salem, Oregon.
1988-12-15 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1988-12-31 Acquired Community First Federal Savings in Vancouver, Washington.
1988-12-31 Changed name to Pacific First Bank, A Fsb .
1990-07-31 Moved bank headquarters from Salem, Oregon to Seattle, Washington.
1990-07-31 Acquired Pacific First Federal Savings Bank in Seattle, Washington.
1990-07-31 Acquired Pacific First Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Costa Mesa, California.
1993-04-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Washington Mutual, A FSB in Seattle, Washington.
1995-12-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Washington Mutual Bank in Seattle, Washington.
1996-01-31 Acquired Western Bank in Coos Bay, Oregon.
1997-01-24 Acquired United Savings Bank in Ogden, Utah.
1998-12-31 Acquired Industrial Bank in Los Angeles, California.
2004-12-20 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2004-12-20 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2005-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Washington Mutual Bank, FA in Stockton, California.
2005-04-04 Changed name to Washington Mutual Bank .
2005-04-04 Moved bank headquarters from Seattle, Washington to Stockton, California.
2005-09-23 Moved bank headquarters from Stockton, California to Henderson, Nevada.
2005-10-01 Acquired Providian National Bank in Tilton, New Hampshire.
2006-03-01 Reorganized.
2006-10-01 Acquired Commercial Capital Bank, Fsb in Irvine, California.
2008-09-25 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-09-25 FDIC closing information for
Washington Mutual Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/wamu.html.
Total assets: $244,141,000
Total deposits: $198,891,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
American Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with American Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9926