Texas
Smith
Tyler
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
23979
1982
FDIC Certificate Number: 23979
FDIC's unique number: 16724
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 544063
Report Date: 1988-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17380
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1982-08-02 Institution established. Original name: American National Bank.
1988-11-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Winnsboro in Winnsboro, Texas.
Total assets: $22,369,000
Total deposits: $22,850,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
American National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with American National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18181