Ohio – Scioto – Portsmouth
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.asbportsmouth.com
Ohio
Scioto
Portsmouth
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
29597
1892
FDIC Certificate Number: 29597
FDIC's unique number: 42431
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus
Federal Reserve ID Number: 455879
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 713E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1892-01-01 Institution established. Original name: American Savings And Loan Association.
1993-07-09 Changed name to American Savings Bank .
1993-07-09 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1995-01-31 Changed name to American Savings Association .
1995-01-31 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings & Loan.
1995-05-10 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1995-07-21 Changed name to American Savings Bank, Fsb .
1995-07-21 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2002-06-28 Acquired Waverly Building And Loan Company in Waverly, Ohio.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $229,477,000
Total deposits: $193,825,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $193,825,000
Equity capital: $19,967,000
Net income: $1,081,000
Return on Assets: 0.94
Return on Equity: 11.27
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
American Savings Bank, Fsb - 7920 Ohio River Rd
American Savings Bank, Fsb - American Savings Bank, Fsb
American Savings Bank, Fsb - South Shore Branch
American Savings Bank, Fsb - Waverly Building And Loan Co. Branc
No associations
LandOfFree
American Savings Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with American Savings Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Savings Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20828