Oklahoma – Custer – Thomas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Oklahoma
Custer
Thomas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8985
1923
FDIC Certificate Number: 8985
FDIC's unique number: 5739
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 524551
Report Date: 1984-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-07-02
1923-11-23 Institution established. Original name: American State Bank.
1984-10-19 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Bank of the West in Thomas, Oklahoma.
1988-02-12 Changed name to The Bank Of The West .
1988-02-12 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Clinton, Oklahoma.
1997-06-05 Acquired The First National Bank Of Leedey in Leedey, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $23,869,000
Total deposits: $22,195,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
American State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with American State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16016