Georgia – Fulton – Roswell
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Roswell
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
57432
2003
FDIC Certificate Number: 57432
FDIC's unique number: 363549
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3179831
Report Date: 2010-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2011-02-07
2003-08-11 Institution established. Original name: American Trust Bank.
2011-02-04 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Renasant Bank in Tupelo, Mississippi.
2011-02-04 FDIC closing information for
American Trust Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/americantrust.html.
Total assets: $238,205,000
Total deposits: $222,161,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
American Trust Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with American Trust Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Trust Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-540