Delaware – New Castle – Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.appliedbank.com
Delaware
New Castle
Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34193
1996
FDIC Certificate Number: 34193
FDIC's unique number: 56851
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2467670
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-09-22
1996-07-01 Institution established. Original name: Cross Country Bank.
1997-12-15 Moved bank headquarters from New Castle, Delaware to Wilmington, Delaware.
2005-07-28 Changed name to Applied Card Bank .
2007-01-23 Changed name to Applied Bank .
2007-05-14 Moved bank headquarters from Wilmington, Delaware to Newark, Delaware.
2007-09-15 Moved bank headquarters from Newark, Delaware to Wilmington, Delaware.
Total assets: $139,782,000
Total deposits: $85,020,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $85,020,000
Equity capital: $54,331,000
Net income: $2,438,000
Return on Assets: 2.38
Return on Equity: 9.19
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Applied Bank - Applied Bank
Applied Bank - Glasgow Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Applied Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Applied Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Applied Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24761