www.atholsb.com
Massachusetts
Worcester
Athol
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
90146
1867
FDIC Certificate Number: 90146
FDIC's unique number: 17741
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 408307
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-03-03
1867-02-12 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Athol Savings Bank.
1985-09-10 Became FDIC insured.
1992-08-14 Acquired Winchendon Savings Bank in Winchendon, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $328,007,000
Total deposits: $279,180,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $279,180,000
Equity capital: $42,389,000
Net income: $926,000
Return on Assets: 0.57
Return on Equity: 4.46
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Athol Savings Bank - Ashburnham Branch
Athol Savings Bank - Athol Branch
Athol Savings Bank - Athol Savings Bank
Athol Savings Bank - Baldwinville Branch
Athol Savings Bank - Barre Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Athol Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Athol Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Athol Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7497