Maine – Androscoggin – Auburn
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.auburnsavings.com
Maine
Androscoggin
Auburn
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
28288
1887
FDIC Certificate Number: 28288
FDIC's unique number: 41122
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 229173
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 701E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1887-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Auburn Savings And Loan Association.
2006-07-01 Changed name to Auburn Savings Bank, Fsb .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $77,985,000
Total deposits: $54,025,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $54,025,000
Equity capital: $5,980,000
Net income: $8,000
Return on Assets: 0.02
Return on Equity: 0.27
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Auburn Savings Bank, Fsb - Auburn Savings Bank, Fsb
Auburn Savings Bank, Fsb - Lewiston Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Auburn Savings Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Auburn Savings Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Auburn Savings Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18072