Massachusetts – Norfolk – Avon
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.avoncoopbank.com
Massachusetts
Norfolk
Avon
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
26617
1914
FDIC Certificate Number: 26617
FDIC's unique number: 35341
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Boston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 178271
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-10-28
1914-01-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Avon Co-operative Bank.
1986-04-03 Became FDIC insured.
2008-09-16 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2008-09-16 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
Total assets: $66,444,000
Total deposits: $57,572,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $57,572,000
Equity capital: $8,424,000
Net income: $109,000
Return on Assets: 0.33
Return on Equity: 2.63
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No associations
LandOfFree
Avon Co-operative Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Avon Co-operative Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Avon Co-operative Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3783