Georgia – Decatur – Bainbridge
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Georgia
Decatur
Bainbridge
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
33365
1991
FDIC Certificate Number: 33365
FDIC's unique number: 46944
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albany Ga
Federal Reserve ID Number: 261735
Report Date: 1998-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22269
The date of the last data update: 1998-10-29
1991-04-01 Institution established. Original name: Bainbridge National Bank.
1998-08-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Community Bank of Southwest Georgia in Bainbridge, Georgia.
2002-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Park Avenue Bank in Valdosta, Georgia.
2011-04-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the Ozarks in Little Rock, Arkansas.
2011-04-29 FDIC closing information for
The Park Avenue Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/parkavenue_ga.html.
Total assets: $79,592,000
Total deposits: $67,248,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bainbridge National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bainbridge National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bainbridge National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15195