South Dakota – Union – Beresford
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.bank360online.com
South Dakota
Union
Beresford
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
30789
1955
FDIC Certificate Number: 30789
FDIC's unique number: 43623
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 85771
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 706E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1955-07-18 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Beresford.
1990-01-17 Changed name to First Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank .
1990-01-17 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
2008-10-14 Changed name to Bank 360 .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $42,372,000
Total deposits: $38,976,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $38,976,000
Equity capital: $3,166,000
Net income: $-67,000
Return on Assets: -0.3
Return on Equity: -4.19
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank 360 - 117 W. Main Street Branch
Bank 360 - Bank 360
Bank 360 - Yankton Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
BANK 360 does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with BANK 360, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and BANK 360 will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6636